THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:58:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Lower Jarvis St
Queens Quay Medical FHO
Toronto ON M5E 1Z2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6478279200
Fax: 6478279202

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Aug 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 24 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Matar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 May 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Matar (CPSO#: 113995 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Lower Jarvis St
Queens Quay Medical FHO
Toronto ON M5E 1Z2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6478279200
Fax: 6478279202

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Aug 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 24 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Matar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 May 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Matar (CPSO#: 113995 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL MATAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL MATAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Nov 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2017
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Nov 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Nov 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Oct 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Oct 2017