THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 04:48:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Albert Ludwig Univ at Freiburg, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-1500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 600-340 College St
Kensington Vision and Research Center
Toronto Ontario M5T 3A9
Phone: 416-928-2132
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 01 Feb 2025
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 01 2025
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Graef Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Graef (CPSO#: 114056 )
Business Address:
Business Address: 555 University Avenue
Attention/Care of S. Graef
Department of Opthalmology
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Albert Ludwig Univ at Freiburg, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-1500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 600-340 College St
Kensington Vision and Research Center
Toronto Ontario M5T 3A9
Phone: 416-928-2132
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 01 Feb 2025
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 01 2025
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Graef Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Graef (CPSO#: 114056 )
Business Address:
Business Address: 555 University Avenue
Attention/Care of S. Graef
Department of Opthalmology
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 Feb 2025
31 Jan 2032
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 01 2025
EXPIRY DATE: Jan 31 2032
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. SYBILLE GRAEF may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Ophthalmology and Vision Services, University of Toronto, in which Dr. GRAEF holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of their academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. GRAEF no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. GRAEF’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. GRAEF’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 February, 2025. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 31 January, 2032.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. SYBILLE GRAEF may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Ophthalmology and Vision Services, University of Toronto, in which Dr. GRAEF holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of their academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. GRAEF no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. GRAEF’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. GRAEF’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 February, 2025. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 31 January, 2032.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Albert Ludwig Univ at Freiburg, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2025
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Oct 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 2025
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 2025
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 31 Jan 2032

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jan 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2017