THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:32:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-260 Nebo Road
Hamilton Ontario L8W 3K5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 381-9800
Fax: (905) 381-9807
Address: 370 Argyle St S
Caledonia ON N3W 2N2
Phone: 2899600733
Fax: 2899600739
Address: 2579 King Street East
Unity Medical Centre
Hamilton Ontario L8K 1Y4
Phone: 289-667-3709
Fax: 289-667-1336

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Sep 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 08 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Srajeldin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Srajeldin (CPSO#: 114083 )
Business Address: 2579 King Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8K 1Y4
289-667-3709

Corporation Name: Ayman Srajeldin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Nov 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Srajeldin (CPSO#: 114083 )
Business Address: 1-260 Nebo Road
Hamilton Ontario L8W 3K5
(905) 381-9800
Business Address: Suite 2
18 Plains Road West
Burlington Ontario L7T 0B3
(905) 218-6444

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-260 Nebo Road
Hamilton Ontario L8W 3K5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 381-9800
Fax: (905) 381-9807
Address: 370 Argyle St S
Caledonia ON N3W 2N2
Phone: 2899600733
Fax: 2899600739
Address: 2579 King Street East
Unity Medical Centre
Hamilton Ontario L8K 1Y4
Phone: 289-667-3709
Fax: 289-667-1336

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Sep 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 08 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Srajeldin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Srajeldin (CPSO#: 114083 )
Business Address: 2579 King Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8K 1Y4
289-667-3709

Corporation Name: Ayman Srajeldin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Nov 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Srajeldin (CPSO#: 114083 )
Business Address: 1-260 Nebo Road
Hamilton Ontario L8W 3K5
(905) 381-9800
Business Address: Suite 2
18 Plains Road West
Burlington Ontario L7T 0B3
(905) 218-6444

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AYMAN SRAJELDIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SRAJELDIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AYMAN SRAJELDIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SRAJELDIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2017
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Oct 2017