THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 17:45:04 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 73 Water Street North
Suite 100
Cambridge ON N1S 7L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-740-1716
Fax: 519-740-1717

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Nov 2017
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gheriani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jul 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Gheriani (CPSO#: 114089 ) Dr. G. Fonseka (CPSO#: 120168 )
Business Address: 100-73 Water Street North
Cambridge Ontario N1R 7L6
519-740-1716

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 73 Water Street North
Suite 100
Cambridge ON N1S 7L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-740-1716
Fax: 519-740-1717

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Nov 2017
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gheriani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jul 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Gheriani (CPSO#: 114089 ) Dr. G. Fonseka (CPSO#: 120168 )
Business Address: 100-73 Water Street North
Cambridge Ontario N1R 7L6
519-740-1716

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
07 Mar 2019
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 07 2019
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Omar Salhin Gheriani may practise medicine independently in family
medicine.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Omar Salhin Gheriani may practise medicine independently in family
medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 07 Mar 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 28 May 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 Nov 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 07 Mar 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 28 May 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Nov 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Nov 2017