THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:51:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Peshawar, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 890 Glasgow Street
Unit 2
Kitchener Ontario N2N 2Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-744-4293
Fax: 519-744-6424
Address: 1700 King Rd #12, King City,
King City Ontario L7B 0N1
Phone: 9058338421
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Unit 14-15-1145 Morningside Ave
Doctors Urgent Care & Family Medicine
Scarborough ON M1B 0A7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Dec 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 20 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Arshad Muhammad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Muhammad (CPSO#: 114095 )
Business Address: Doctor's Urgent Care and Family Medicine
Unit 14-15
1145 Morningside Avenue
Scarborough Ontario M1B 0A7
(647) 352-3621
Business Address: 15 - 630 Peter Robertson Boulevard
Brampton Ontario L6R 1T4
(905) 793-8868
Business Address: 12-1700 King Rd
King City ON L7B 0N1
+1-905-833-8421

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Peshawar, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 890 Glasgow Street
Unit 2
Kitchener Ontario N2N 2Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-744-4293
Fax: 519-744-6424
Address: 1700 King Rd #12, King City,
King City Ontario L7B 0N1
Phone: 9058338421
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Unit 14-15-1145 Morningside Ave
Doctors Urgent Care & Family Medicine
Scarborough ON M1B 0A7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Dec 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 20 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Arshad Muhammad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Muhammad (CPSO#: 114095 )
Business Address: Doctor's Urgent Care and Family Medicine
Unit 14-15
1145 Morningside Avenue
Scarborough Ontario M1B 0A7
(647) 352-3621
Business Address: 15 - 630 Peter Robertson Boulevard
Brampton Ontario L6R 1T4
(905) 793-8868
Business Address: 12-1700 King Rd
King City ON L7B 0N1
+1-905-833-8421

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARSHAD MUHAMMAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUHAMMAD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARSHAD MUHAMMAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUHAMMAD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Peshawar, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Apr 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 2017
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 26 Apr 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Apr 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Oct 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Oct 2017