THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:06:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 167 Rolph St
Tillsonburg Ontario N4G 3Y9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 8423611
Extension: 5232
Fax: 519 8427008

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 15 Dec 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 15 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
HOSPITAL: Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Tillsonburg

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sikandar Hayat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Oct 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hayat (CPSO#: 114110 )
Business Address: 167 Rolph Street
Tillsonburg Ontario N4G 3Y9
(519) 842-3611

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 167 Rolph St
Tillsonburg Ontario N4G 3Y9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 8423611
Extension: 5232
Fax: 519 8427008

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 15 Dec 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 15 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
HOSPITAL: Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Tillsonburg

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sikandar Hayat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Oct 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hayat (CPSO#: 114110 )
Business Address: 167 Rolph Street
Tillsonburg Ontario N4G 3Y9
(519) 842-3611

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SIKANDAR HAYAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAYAT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SIKANDAR HAYAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAYAT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2017
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Nov 2017