THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:28:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Division of Anesthesia
399 Bathurst St
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 603-2581
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 55 University Ave
M0002
Toronto ON M5J 2H7
Phone: 4167223393
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 28 Aug 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 28 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Sahni Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jan 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sahni (CPSO#: 114120 )
Business Address: 399 Bathurst St
MCL 2-405
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
416-603-5118
Business Address: M002-55 University Ave
Toronto ON M5J 2H7
416-722-3393

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Division of Anesthesia
399 Bathurst St
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 603-2581
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 55 University Ave
M0002
Toronto ON M5J 2H7
Phone: 4167223393
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 28 Aug 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 28 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Sahni Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jan 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sahni (CPSO#: 114120 )
Business Address: 399 Bathurst St
MCL 2-405
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
416-603-5118
Business Address: M002-55 University Ave
Toronto ON M5J 2H7
416-722-3393

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SACHIN SAHNI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAHNI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SACHIN SAHNI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAHNI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 09 Feb 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 2018
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jan 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 09 Feb 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jan 2018