THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:16:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: The University of Rochester, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 198 Des Newman Boulevard
3rd floor
Whitby Ontario L1P 1Y5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-721-4968
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Lakeridge Health
1 Hospital Ct
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 22 Nov 2017
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Godleski Rollins Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Nov 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Rollins (CPSO#: 114126 ) Dr. M. Godleski (CPSO#: 108154 )
Business Address: Oshawa Clinic
117 King Street East
Oshawa Ontario L1H 1B9
(905) 723-8551
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences
St. John's Rehab Campus
Suite S124
285 Cummer Avenue
Toronto Ontario M2M 2G1
(416) 226-6780 Extn: 7174
Business Address: Lakeridge Health
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: The University of Rochester, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 198 Des Newman Boulevard
3rd floor
Whitby Ontario L1P 1Y5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-721-4968
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Lakeridge Health
1 Hospital Ct
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 22 Nov 2017
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Godleski Rollins Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Nov 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Rollins (CPSO#: 114126 ) Dr. M. Godleski (CPSO#: 108154 )
Business Address: Oshawa Clinic
117 King Street East
Oshawa Ontario L1H 1B9
(905) 723-8551
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences
St. John's Rehab Campus
Suite S124
285 Cummer Avenue
Toronto Ontario M2M 2G1
(416) 226-6780 Extn: 7174
Business Address: Lakeridge Health
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
22 Mar 2019
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 22 2019
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Karen Elaine Rollins may practise medicine independently in neurology.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Karen Elaine Rollins may practise medicine independently in neurology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: The University of Rochester, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 22 Mar 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 22 Mar 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Nov 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Nov 2017