THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 06:19:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, YORUBA

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North Bay Regional Health Centre
Department of Forensic Psychiatry
PO BOX 2500
50 College Drvie
North Bay Ontario P1B 5A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705 474 8600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Forensic Psychiatry
Effective: 27 Oct 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Psychiatry
Effective: 09 Nov 2017
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Forensic Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 27 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 09 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Adedayo Alabi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Alabi (CPSO#: 114128 )
Business Address: 50 College Drive
North Bay Ontario P1B 5A4
(705) 474-8600
Business Address: Northern Ontario School of Medicine
Clinical Science Division
935 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 2C6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, YORUBA
Medical School: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North Bay Regional Health Centre
Department of Forensic Psychiatry
PO BOX 2500
50 College Drvie
North Bay Ontario P1B 5A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705 474 8600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Forensic Psychiatry
Effective: 27 Oct 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Psychiatry
Effective: 09 Nov 2017
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Forensic Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 27 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 09 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Adedayo Alabi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Alabi (CPSO#: 114128 )
Business Address: 50 College Drive
North Bay Ontario P1B 5A4
(705) 474-8600
Business Address: Northern Ontario School of Medicine
Clinical Science Division
935 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 2C6

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
27 Oct 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Oct 27 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ADEDAYO AYOKUNU ALABI may practise medicine independently in Psychiatry and Forensic Psychiatry.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ADEDAYO AYOKUNU ALABI may practise medicine independently in Psychiatry and Forensic Psychiatry.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 27 Oct 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 27 Oct 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Nov 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Nov 2017