THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:25:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Excellent care Medical center
184 Clarence St
Brampton Ontario L6W 1T3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 230-6300
Fax: (905) 230-6400

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Dec 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. George Saad Tawfic Tawadros Elraheb Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Tawadros Elraheb (CPSO#: 114129 )
Business Address: eMichael Medical Centre
Suite C4
802 Southdown Road
Mississauga Ontario L5S 2Y4
(289) 628-1930
Business Address: Excellent Care Medical Centre
184 Clarence Street
Brampton Ontario L6W 1T3
(905) 230-6300

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Excellent care Medical center
184 Clarence St
Brampton Ontario L6W 1T3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 230-6300
Fax: (905) 230-6400

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Dec 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. George Saad Tawfic Tawadros Elraheb Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Tawadros Elraheb (CPSO#: 114129 )
Business Address: eMichael Medical Centre
Suite C4
802 Southdown Road
Mississauga Ontario L5S 2Y4
(289) 628-1930
Business Address: Excellent Care Medical Centre
184 Clarence Street
Brampton Ontario L6W 1T3
(905) 230-6300

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEORGE SAAD TAWFIC TAWADROS ELRAHEB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAWADROS ELRAHEB is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEORGE SAAD TAWFIC TAWADROS ELRAHEB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAWADROS ELRAHEB is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Feb 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Feb 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Feb 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Nov 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Nov 2017