THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:15:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Sackler School of Medicine, Tel Aviv University, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 901 King St W
Suite 105
Toronto Ontario M5V 3H5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-599-6000
Fax: 416-599-9731
Address: 19 Bold St
Hamilton ON L8P 1T3
Phone: (905) 540-1900
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2425 Bloor St W
Toronto ON M6S 4W4
Phone: (416) 849-4595
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 101 The Queensway
Toronto ON M6S 5B4
Phone: (905) 629-4516
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 727 Hillsdale Ave E
Toronto ON M4S 1V4
Phone: (416) 932-0446
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 302 Gerrard St E
Toronto ON M5A 2G7
Phone: (416) 323-0642
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Apr 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 25 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alona Nayot Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Nov 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Nayot (CPSO#: 114130 )
Business Address: 401-101 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2P7
(905) 629-4516
Business Address: 403-2425 Bloor Street West
Toronto Ontario M6S 4W4
(416) 849-4595
Business Address: 727 Hillsdale Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M4S 1V4
(416) 932-0446
Business Address: 2nd Floor
19 Bold Street
Hamilton Ontario K8P 1T3
(905) 540-1900
Business Address: 105-901 King Street West
Toronto Ontario M5V 2H5
(416) 599-6000
Business Address: 302 Gerrard St E
Toronto ON M5A 2G7
(416) 323-0642

Corporation Name: Nayot Sheiner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Aug 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Sackler School of Medicine, Tel Aviv University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 901 King St W
Suite 105
Toronto Ontario M5V 3H5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-599-6000
Fax: 416-599-9731
Address: 19 Bold St
Hamilton ON L8P 1T3
Phone: (905) 540-1900
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2425 Bloor St W
Toronto ON M6S 4W4
Phone: (416) 849-4595
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 101 The Queensway
Toronto ON M6S 5B4
Phone: (905) 629-4516
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 727 Hillsdale Ave E
Toronto ON M4S 1V4
Phone: (416) 932-0446
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 302 Gerrard St E
Toronto ON M5A 2G7
Phone: (416) 323-0642
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Apr 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 25 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alona Nayot Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Nov 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Nayot (CPSO#: 114130 )
Business Address: 401-101 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2P7
(905) 629-4516
Business Address: 403-2425 Bloor Street West
Toronto Ontario M6S 4W4
(416) 849-4595
Business Address: 727 Hillsdale Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M4S 1V4
(416) 932-0446
Business Address: 2nd Floor
19 Bold Street
Hamilton Ontario K8P 1T3
(905) 540-1900
Business Address: 105-901 King Street West
Toronto Ontario M5V 2H5
(416) 599-6000
Business Address: 302 Gerrard St E
Toronto ON M5A 2G7
(416) 323-0642

Corporation Name: Nayot Sheiner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Aug 2019

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALONA NAYOT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAYOT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALONA NAYOT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAYOT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Sackler School of Medicine, Tel Aviv University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Sep 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Nov 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Nov 2017