THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 07:03:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 33 Beverly Hills Drive
Toronto Ontario M3L 1A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-630-1712
Fax: 416-630-6415
Address: Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
610 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 2C1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst St
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 29 May 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 29 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: AMINOLTEJARI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Oct 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Aminoltejari (CPSO#: 114138 )
Business Address: 610 University Ave
C/O Mailroom 3B-114
Toronto ON M5G 2M9
437-331-7592
Business Address:

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 33 Beverly Hills Drive
Toronto Ontario M3L 1A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-630-1712
Fax: 416-630-6415
Address: Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
610 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 2C1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst St
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 29 May 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 29 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: AMINOLTEJARI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Oct 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Aminoltejari (CPSO#: 114138 )
Business Address: 610 University Ave
C/O Mailroom 3B-114
Toronto ON M5G 2M9
437-331-7592
Business Address:

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KHATEREH AMINOLTEJARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMINOLTEJARI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KHATEREH AMINOLTEJARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMINOLTEJARI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 23 Aug 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 Feb 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Oct 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Feb 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Feb 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Aug 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 23 Aug 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 Feb 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 2018