THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 05:09:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's Hospital Medical School, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Centre for Addiction
and Mental Health
1001 Queen Street West
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 535-8501
Extension: 37838
Fax: No Information Available
Address: CAMH
100 Stokes Street
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Centre for Addiction
and Mental Health
100 Stokes Street
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 01 Dec 2017
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MI Husain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Husain (CPSO#: 114155 )
Business Address: 100 Stokes St
Toronto ON M6J 1H4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU
Medical School: St. George's Hospital Medical School, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Centre for Addiction
and Mental Health
1001 Queen Street West
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 535-8501
Extension: 37838
Fax: No Information Available
Address: CAMH
100 Stokes Street
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Centre for Addiction
and Mental Health
100 Stokes Street
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 01 Dec 2017
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MI Husain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Husain (CPSO#: 114155 )
Business Address: 100 Stokes St
Toronto ON M6J 1H4

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
26 Mar 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 26 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MUHAMMAD ISHRAT HUSAIN may practise medicine independently in psychiatry.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MUHAMMAD ISHRAT HUSAIN may practise medicine independently in psychiatry.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's Hospital Medical School, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 26 Mar 2024
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 10 Nov 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 26 Mar 2024

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 10 Nov 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2017