THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:44:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 305-7800 Kennedy Rd
Markham ON L3R 2C7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-554-3755
Fax: 905-554-3752

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 19 May 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 19 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. ARPITA GANTAYET MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Mar 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gantayet (CPSO#: 114180 )
Business Address: 7800 Kennedy Road
Markham Rheumatology Hub
Unit 305
Markham Ontario L3R 2C7
9055543755
Business Address: 195 County Court Blvd
Unit 100
Brampton ON L6W 4P7
905 799 1850 Extn: 241
Business Address: 40 Finchgate Blvd
Suite 314
Brampton ON L6T 3J1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 305-7800 Kennedy Rd
Markham ON L3R 2C7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-554-3755
Fax: 905-554-3752

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 19 May 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 19 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. ARPITA GANTAYET MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Mar 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gantayet (CPSO#: 114180 )
Business Address: 7800 Kennedy Road
Markham Rheumatology Hub
Unit 305
Markham Ontario L3R 2C7
9055543755
Business Address: 195 County Court Blvd
Unit 100
Brampton ON L6W 4P7
905 799 1850 Extn: 241
Business Address: 40 Finchgate Blvd
Suite 314
Brampton ON L6T 3J1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARPITA GANTAYET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GANTAYET is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARPITA GANTAYET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GANTAYET is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 26 Aug 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 Feb 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2018
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Apr 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 Feb 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 2018