THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:55:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Nigeria, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, IGBO

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Scarborough Health Network
Birchmount Hospital Site
3030 Birchmount Rd
Scarborough Ontario M1W 3W3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 495-2563
Fax: (416) 495-2426
Address: 8707 Dufferin Street
Unit 26
Thea Medical Clinic
Vaughan Ontario L4J 0A2
Phone: 416-480-6565
Fax: 647-493-3231

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 11 May 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 11 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nigeria

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chijioke Ukwe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jan 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Ukwe (CPSO#: 114182 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, IGBO
Medical School: University of Nigeria, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Scarborough Health Network
Birchmount Hospital Site
3030 Birchmount Rd
Scarborough Ontario M1W 3W3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 495-2563
Fax: (416) 495-2426
Address: 8707 Dufferin Street
Unit 26
Thea Medical Clinic
Vaughan Ontario L4J 0A2
Phone: 416-480-6565
Fax: 647-493-3231

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 11 May 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 11 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nigeria

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chijioke Ukwe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jan 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Ukwe (CPSO#: 114182 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHIJIOKE TAGBO UKWE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UKWE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHIJIOKE TAGBO UKWE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UKWE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Nigeria, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Apr 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2017
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Apr 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Apr 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 2017