THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:42:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 192 Lily Lake Rd
Campbellton NB E3N 3K2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (506) 789-5000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 15 Oct 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 15 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Canada - New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Braganza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Braganza (CPSO#: 114194 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 192 Lily Lake Rd
Campbellton NB E3N 3K2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (506) 789-5000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 15 Oct 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 15 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Canada - New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Braganza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Braganza (CPSO#: 114194 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID ANDREW BRAGANZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRAGANZA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID ANDREW BRAGANZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRAGANZA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2017
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2017