THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:02:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2011
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH, UKRAINIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 102-2200 Fairview St
Burlington ON L7R 4H9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-333-0116
Fax: 905-333-5877

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Jan 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 29 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lukasz Piskozub Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jun 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Piskozub (CPSO#: 114199 )
Business Address: Huron Medical Centre
1472 Huron Street
London Ontario N5V 2E5
519 601 6640
Business Address: 2200 Fairview Street
Burlington Ontario L7R 4H9
9053330`116

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH, UKRAINIAN
Medical School: Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 102-2200 Fairview St
Burlington ON L7R 4H9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-333-0116
Fax: 905-333-5877

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Jan 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 29 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lukasz Piskozub Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jun 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Piskozub (CPSO#: 114199 )
Business Address: Huron Medical Centre
1472 Huron Street
London Ontario N5V 2E5
519 601 6640
Business Address: 2200 Fairview Street
Burlington Ontario L7R 4H9
9053330`116

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LUKASZ TOMASZ PISKOZUB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PISKOZUB is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LUKASZ TOMASZ PISKOZUB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PISKOZUB is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Oct 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2017
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 2017