THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:00:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Hamadan Medical School, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 1
2810 Major Mackenzie Drive
Maple Ontario L6A 3L2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 832-3838
Fax: (905) 832-9097

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mahnaz Karimi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Sep 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Karimi (CPSO#: 114203 )
Business Address: 1 - 2810 Major Mackenzie Drive
Maple Ontario L6A 3L2
(905) 832-3838

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: Hamadan Medical School, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 1
2810 Major Mackenzie Drive
Maple Ontario L6A 3L2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 832-3838
Fax: (905) 832-9097

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mahnaz Karimi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Sep 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Karimi (CPSO#: 114203 )
Business Address: 1 - 2810 Major Mackenzie Drive
Maple Ontario L6A 3L2
(905) 832-3838

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAHNAZ KARIMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KARIMI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAHNAZ KARIMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KARIMI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Hamadan Medical School, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 2017
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Dec 2017