THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:40:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Barcelona, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CATALAN, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Avenue
A217
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164804746
Fax: 4164805251

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 01 Mar 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 01 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MARIA TERRICABRAS CASAS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Terricabras Casas (CPSO#: 114214 )
Business Address: a217-2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CATALAN, SPANISH
Medical School: University of Barcelona, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Avenue
A217
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164804746
Fax: 4164805251

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 01 Mar 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 01 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MARIA TERRICABRAS CASAS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Terricabras Casas (CPSO#: 114214 )
Business Address: a217-2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 Mar 2024
28 Feb 2031
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 01 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Feb 28 2031
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. MARIA TERRICABRAS CASAS may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Cardiology, University of Toronto, in which Dr. TERRICABRAS CASAS holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. TERRICABRAS CASAS no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. TERRICABRAS CASAS’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. TERRICABRAS CASAS’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 March, 2024. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 28 February, 2031.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. MARIA TERRICABRAS CASAS may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Cardiology, University of Toronto, in which Dr. TERRICABRAS CASAS holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. TERRICABRAS CASAS no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. TERRICABRAS CASAS’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. TERRICABRAS CASAS’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 March, 2024. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 28 February, 2031.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Barcelona, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Jul 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Mar 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 28 Feb 2031

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Mar 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Mar 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Mar 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Mar 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2018