THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 04:43:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 78 Corporate Dr
Unit 10
Scarborough ON M1H 3G4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 279 0855
Fax: 416 279 0857

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 01 Oct 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yun Cong Zhang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Nov 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Zhang (CPSO#: 114221 )
Business Address: 3050 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough ON M1P 2V5
416-438-2911
Business Address: 10-78 Corporate Dr
Scarborough ON M1H 3G4
416 279 0855 Extn: 291

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 78 Corporate Dr
Unit 10
Scarborough ON M1H 3G4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 279 0855
Fax: 416 279 0857

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 01 Oct 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yun Cong Zhang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Nov 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Zhang (CPSO#: 114221 )
Business Address: 3050 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough ON M1P 2V5
416-438-2911
Business Address: 10-78 Corporate Dr
Scarborough ON M1H 3G4
416 279 0855 Extn: 291

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YUN CONG ZHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YUN CONG ZHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 08 Apr 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 Feb 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2018
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Mar 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 08 Apr 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Mar 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 Feb 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 2018