THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:29:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 527 Adelaide Street
Woodstock Ontario N4S 4B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 533-6402
Fax: (226) 242-2580
Address: 12 Perry St
Woodstock ON N4S 3C2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 27 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Frank Ferlisi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Aug 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Ferlisi (CPSO#: 114223 )
Business Address: 333 Athlone Avenue
Suite 102
Woodstock Ontario N4V 0B8
(519) 533-6402
Business Address: 527 Adelaide St
Woodstock ON N4S 4B5
5195336402

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 527 Adelaide Street
Woodstock Ontario N4S 4B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 533-6402
Fax: (226) 242-2580
Address: 12 Perry St
Woodstock ON N4S 3C2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 27 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Frank Ferlisi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Aug 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Ferlisi (CPSO#: 114223 )
Business Address: 333 Athlone Avenue
Suite 102
Woodstock Ontario N4V 0B8
(519) 533-6402
Business Address: 527 Adelaide St
Woodstock ON N4S 4B5
5195336402

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FRANK FERLISI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERLISI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FRANK FERLISI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERLISI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Jan 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2018
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Oct 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 26 Oct 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Jan 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2018