THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:31:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 401-71 King St W
Mississauga ON L5B 4A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9052739793
Fax: 9052737054
Address: 401-71 King St W
Mississauga ON L5B 4A2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Dec 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. JENNIFER CHOU MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Oct 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Chou (CPSO#: 114245 )
Business Address: 401-71 King St W
Mississauga ON L5B 4A2
9052759793

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN
Medical School: Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 401-71 King St W
Mississauga ON L5B 4A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9052739793
Fax: 9052737054
Address: 401-71 King St W
Mississauga ON L5B 4A2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Dec 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. JENNIFER CHOU MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Oct 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Chou (CPSO#: 114245 )
Business Address: 401-71 King St W
Mississauga ON L5B 4A2
9052759793

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHEN-YU JENNIFER CHOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHEN-YU JENNIFER CHOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Dec 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Dec 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Feb 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Feb 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Dec 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Dec 2017