THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:03:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2-1650 Queensdale Ave
Gloucester ON K1T 1N8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-244-4400
Fax: 613-244-3399

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jul 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 24 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pascale Cote Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 May 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Cote (CPSO#: 114248 )
Business Address: 2-1650 Queensdale Ave
Gloucester ON K1T 1N8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2-1650 Queensdale Ave
Gloucester ON K1T 1N8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-244-4400
Fax: 613-244-3399

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jul 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 24 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pascale Cote Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 May 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Cote (CPSO#: 114248 )
Business Address: 2-1650 Queensdale Ave
Gloucester ON K1T 1N8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PASCALE COTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COTE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PASCALE COTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COTE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 Feb 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Mar 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 Feb 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 2018