THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:31:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical Academy of Silesia, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1295 Riverbend Road
London Ontario N6k 0G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-432-1919
Fax: 519-432-9529

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Dec 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Samir Datta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Aug 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Datta (CPSO#: 114251 )
Business Address: 1295 Riverbend Road
Suite 200
London Ontario N6k 0G2
Business Address: Thompson Medical Centre
130 Thompson Road
London Ontario N5Z 2Y6
(519) 601-8621

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Medical Academy of Silesia, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1295 Riverbend Road
London Ontario N6k 0G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-432-1919
Fax: 519-432-9529

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Dec 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Samir Datta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Aug 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Datta (CPSO#: 114251 )
Business Address: 1295 Riverbend Road
Suite 200
London Ontario N6k 0G2
Business Address: Thompson Medical Centre
130 Thompson Road
London Ontario N5Z 2Y6
(519) 601-8621

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMIR RANJAN DATTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DATTA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMIR RANJAN DATTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DATTA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical Academy of Silesia, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2017
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2017