THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:09:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Thunder Bay Regional
Health Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 684-6000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 146 Court St S
Thunder Bay ON P7B 2X6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 16 Nov 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Egypt

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mohammed Bassuony Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Nov 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bassuony (CPSO#: 114258 )
Business Address: 980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
(519) 722-4700

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Thunder Bay Regional
Health Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 684-6000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 146 Court St S
Thunder Bay ON P7B 2X6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 16 Nov 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Egypt

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mohammed Bassuony Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Nov 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bassuony (CPSO#: 114258 )
Business Address: 980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
(519) 722-4700

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
21 Nov 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Nov 21 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MOHAMMED MAGDY FOUAD ELSAYED BASSUONY may practise medicine independently in internal medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MOHAMMED MAGDY FOUAD ELSAYED BASSUONY may practise medicine independently in internal medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 21 Nov 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Nov 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 21 Nov 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Nov 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 16 Nov 2019
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Nov 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Feb 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jan 2018