THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:55:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of London, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 Bond Street
St Michael's Hospital
Department of Neurosurgery
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 360 4000
Extension: 78191
Fax: 4168643016

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Saira Alli Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jul 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Alli (CPSO#: 114286 )
Business Address: 30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
4163604000 Extn: 78191

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of London, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 Bond Street
St Michael's Hospital
Department of Neurosurgery
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 360 4000
Extension: 78191
Fax: 4168643016

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Saira Alli Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jul 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Alli (CPSO#: 114286 )
Business Address: 30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
4163604000 Extn: 78191

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAIRA BANU ALLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALLI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAIRA BANU ALLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALLI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of London, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 May 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 16 Feb 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 May 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 16 Feb 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jan 2018