THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:11:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 112-1670 North Service Rd E
Ironoak Medical Clinic
Oakville ON L6H 7G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-815-2995
Fax: 289-815-2997
Address: 66 West Avenue
LifestyleRx
St. Thomas Ontario N5R 5H7
Phone: 778-653-2427
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 25 Apr 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 25 Apr 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 25 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 25 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. SAIDE NAKAZI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Nov 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Nakazi (CPSO#: 114336 )
Business Address: 112-1670 North Service Rd E
Oakville ON L6H 7G3
289-815-2995

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 112-1670 North Service Rd E
Ironoak Medical Clinic
Oakville ON L6H 7G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-815-2995
Fax: 289-815-2997
Address: 66 West Avenue
LifestyleRx
St. Thomas Ontario N5R 5H7
Phone: 778-653-2427
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 25 Apr 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 25 Apr 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 25 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 25 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. SAIDE NAKAZI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Nov 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Nakazi (CPSO#: 114336 )
Business Address: 112-1670 North Service Rd E
Oakville ON L6H 7G3
289-815-2995

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
18 May 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 18 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. SAIDE NAKAZI may practise medicine independently in internal medicine and endocrinology and metabolism.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. SAIDE NAKAZI may practise medicine independently in internal medicine and endocrinology and metabolism.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 18 May 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 09 Mar 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 May 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 May 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 09 Mar 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Feb 2018