THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:40:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058452571
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mirit Kaldas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Mar 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kaldas (CPSO#: 114344 )
Business Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 0L8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058452571
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mirit Kaldas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Mar 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kaldas (CPSO#: 114344 )
Business Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 0L8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MIRIT MAZLOUM SAWIRES KALDAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KALDAS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MIRIT MAZLOUM SAWIRES KALDAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KALDAS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 Nov 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 Nov 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Mar 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jan 2018