THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:33:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the West Indies, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Integra Health
130 King St W
Unit 1320
Toronto ON M5X 2A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 777-9355
Fax: (416) 777-9365
Address: 187 Carlton Street
Toronto Ontario M5A 2K7
Phone: 2893013011
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Burton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Aug 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Burton (CPSO#: 114359 )
Business Address: 130 King Street West
Suite 1320
Toronto Ontario M5X 1C8
(416) 777-9355

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of the West Indies, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Integra Health
130 King St W
Unit 1320
Toronto ON M5X 2A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 777-9355
Fax: (416) 777-9365
Address: 187 Carlton Street
Toronto Ontario M5A 2K7
Phone: 2893013011
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Burton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Aug 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Burton (CPSO#: 114359 )
Business Address: 130 King Street West
Suite 1320
Toronto Ontario M5X 1C8
(416) 777-9355

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STACY CHANTAL BURTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURTON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STACY CHANTAL BURTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURTON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the West Indies, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Jan 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Jan 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 2018