THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:24:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Cape Town Faculty of Health Sciences, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Joseph's Health Care London
Department of Ophthalmology
268 Grosvenor St
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 646-6232
Fax: (519) 646-6251

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 12 Jan 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 12 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Matthew Anderson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jan 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Anderson (CPSO#: 114360 )
Business Address: St. Joseph's Healthcare London
Department of Ophthamology
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 682-8250

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Cape Town Faculty of Health Sciences, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Joseph's Health Care London
Department of Ophthalmology
268 Grosvenor St
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 646-6232
Fax: (519) 646-6251

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 12 Jan 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 12 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Matthew Anderson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jan 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Anderson (CPSO#: 114360 )
Business Address: St. Joseph's Healthcare London
Department of Ophthamology
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 682-8250

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
12 Oct 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Oct 12 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MATTHEW FREDERICK ANDERSON may practise medicine independently in ophthalmology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MATTHEW FREDERICK ANDERSON may practise medicine independently in ophthalmology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Cape Town Faculty of Health Sciences, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 12 Oct 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 12 Oct 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2018