THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:55:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Tichreen, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 435 Notre Dame Ave
Sudbury ON P3C 5K6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: 705 419 2636
Address: 2-435 Notre Dame Ave
Sudbury ON P3C 5K6
Phone: 7052227661
Fax: 7054192636

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 19 Apr 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Gastroenterology
Effective: 19 Apr 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 19 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 19 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anas Hussam Eddin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hussam Eddin (CPSO#: 114363 )
Business Address: 435 Notre Dame Ave
Sudbury ON P3C 5K6
705 222 7661
Business Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Tichreen, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 435 Notre Dame Ave
Sudbury ON P3C 5K6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: 705 419 2636
Address: 2-435 Notre Dame Ave
Sudbury ON P3C 5K6
Phone: 7052227661
Fax: 7054192636

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 19 Apr 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Gastroenterology
Effective: 19 Apr 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 19 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 19 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anas Hussam Eddin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hussam Eddin (CPSO#: 114363 )
Business Address: 435 Notre Dame Ave
Sudbury ON P3C 5K6
705 222 7661
Business Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
19 Apr 2021
18 Feb 2027
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Apr 19 2021
EXPIRY DATE: Feb 18 2027
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. MOHAMAD ANAS HUSSAM EDDIN may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Internal Medicine, Division of Clinical Sciences, Northern Ontario School of Medicine, in which Dr. HUSSAM EDDIN holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. HUSSAM EDDIN no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. HUSSAM EDDIN’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. HUSSAM EDDIN’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 19 April, 2021, and expires on 18 February, 2027. Upon renewal of Dr. HUSSAM EDDIN's academic appointment at the Northern Ontario School of Medicine, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. MOHAMAD ANAS HUSSAM EDDIN may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Internal Medicine, Division of Clinical Sciences, Northern Ontario School of Medicine, in which Dr. HUSSAM EDDIN holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. HUSSAM EDDIN no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. HUSSAM EDDIN’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. HUSSAM EDDIN’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 19 April, 2021, and expires on 18 February, 2027. Upon renewal of Dr. HUSSAM EDDIN's academic appointment at the Northern Ontario School of Medicine, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Tichreen, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 18 Apr 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Apr 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Apr 2021
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 18 Feb 2027

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 18 Apr 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Mar 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2018