THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:36:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Paris, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: University of Ottawa
Heart Institute
40 rue Ruskin, H3412
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-696-7337
Fax: 613-696-7127

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 16 Jan 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 16 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University of Ottawa Heart Institute Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
HOSPITAL: University of Ottawa Heart Institute
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Messika-Zeitoun Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Dec 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Messika-Zeitoun (CPSO#: 114364 )
Business Address: University of Ottawa Heart Institute
Suite H3412
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
(613) 696-7337

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Paris, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: University of Ottawa
Heart Institute
40 rue Ruskin, H3412
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-696-7337
Fax: 613-696-7127

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 16 Jan 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 16 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University of Ottawa Heart Institute Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
HOSPITAL: University of Ottawa Heart Institute
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Messika-Zeitoun Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Dec 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Messika-Zeitoun (CPSO#: 114364 )
Business Address: University of Ottawa Heart Institute
Suite H3412
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
(613) 696-7337

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
24 Nov 2020
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Nov 24 2020
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. David Messika-Zeitoun may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
Division of Cardiology, University of Ottawa, in which Dr. Messika-
Zeitoun holds an academic appointment at the rank of Full
Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Messika-
Zeitoun no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.






VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. David Messika-Zeitoun may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
Division of Cardiology, University of Ottawa, in which Dr. Messika-
Zeitoun holds an academic appointment at the rank of Full
Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Messika-
Zeitoun no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.






Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Paris, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 14 Dec 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2018
DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 14 Dec 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2018