THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:00:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Guru Nanak Dev University, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 56 Westmore Drive
Cheema Children Clinic
unit 102
Toronto Ontario M9V 3Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-743-0700
Fax: 416-745-0500

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 16 Jan 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 16 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Barjinder S Cheema Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Aug 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Cheema (CPSO#: 114373 )
Business Address: 56 Westmore Drive
Cheema Children Clinc
Unit 102
Toronto Ontario M9V 3Y6
416-743-0700

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Guru Nanak Dev University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 56 Westmore Drive
Cheema Children Clinic
unit 102
Toronto Ontario M9V 3Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-743-0700
Fax: 416-745-0500

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 16 Jan 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 16 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Barjinder S Cheema Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Aug 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Cheema (CPSO#: 114373 )
Business Address: 56 Westmore Drive
Cheema Children Clinc
Unit 102
Toronto Ontario M9V 3Y6
416-743-0700

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
03 Jun 2019
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jun 03 2019
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Barjinder Singh Cheema may practise medicine independently in pediatrics.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Barjinder Singh Cheema may practise medicine independently in pediatrics.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Guru Nanak Dev University, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 03 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 03 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2018