THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:50:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 7
8405 Financial Drive
Brampton Ontario L6Y 1M1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 846 2299
Fax: 289 720 2074

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Dec 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 13 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gurleen Dhanoa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Jan 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Dhanoa (CPSO#: 114374 )
Business Address: 7-8405 Financial Drive
Brampton Ontario L6Y 1M1
(905) 846-2299

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 7
8405 Financial Drive
Brampton Ontario L6Y 1M1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 846 2299
Fax: 289 720 2074

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Dec 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 13 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gurleen Dhanoa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Jan 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Dhanoa (CPSO#: 114374 )
Business Address: 7-8405 Financial Drive
Brampton Ontario L6Y 1M1
(905) 846-2299

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GURLEEN KAUR DHANOA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHANOA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GURLEEN KAUR DHANOA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHANOA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 02 Mar 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Dec 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 02 Mar 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Feb 2018