THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/04/25 21:29:04 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Nigeria, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 272 Oxford Street West
City Clinic & Wellness Center
London ON N6H 1S9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1-519-204-8800
Fax: 1-855-975-2696

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Aug 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 26 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Itoro Ime Udo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Udo (CPSO#: 114394 )
Business Address: 35 Metcalfe Street
Woodstock Ontario N4S 3E6
(519) 539-0181
Business Address: 550 Wellington Road
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6100
Business Address: 272 Oxford Street West
London Ontario N6H 1S9
519-204-8800

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Nigeria, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 272 Oxford Street West
City Clinic & Wellness Center
London ON N6H 1S9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1-519-204-8800
Fax: 1-855-975-2696

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Aug 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 26 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Itoro Ime Udo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Udo (CPSO#: 114394 )
Business Address: 35 Metcalfe Street
Woodstock Ontario N4S 3E6
(519) 539-0181
Business Address: 550 Wellington Road
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6100
Business Address: 272 Oxford Street West
London Ontario N6H 1S9
519-204-8800

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ITORO IME UDO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UDO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ITORO IME UDO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UDO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Nigeria, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Mar 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jan 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Jan 2018