THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:30:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN, POLISH, RUSSIAN, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101-1550 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 1K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 0
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 28 Nov 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 28 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Poland
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. Kaczmarek Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Mar 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Kaczmarek (CPSO#: 114446 )
Business Address: 1428 Ouellette Avenue
Suite 302
Windsor Ontario N8X 1K4
(519) 252-2757

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN, POLISH, RUSSIAN, SPANISH
Medical School: Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101-1550 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 1K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 0
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 28 Nov 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 28 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Poland
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. Kaczmarek Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Mar 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Kaczmarek (CPSO#: 114446 )
Business Address: 1428 Ouellette Avenue
Suite 302
Windsor Ontario N8X 1K4
(519) 252-2757

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BARTOSZ FILIP KACZMAREK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KACZMAREK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BARTOSZ FILIP KACZMAREK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KACZMAREK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 2018
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Feb 2018