THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:37:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Steeles Ave W
Thornhill ON L4J 7L2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9057386699
Fax: 9057386073

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Mar 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 07 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Asa Chu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Dec 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chu (CPSO#: 114452 )
Business Address: A4-800 Steeles Ave W
Thornhill ON L4J 7L2
(905) 738-6699

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Steeles Ave W
Thornhill ON L4J 7L2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9057386699
Fax: 9057386073

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Mar 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 07 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Asa Chu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Dec 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chu (CPSO#: 114452 )
Business Address: A4-800 Steeles Ave W
Thornhill ON L4J 7L2
(905) 738-6699

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ASA SEBASTIAN CHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ASA SEBASTIAN CHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Sep 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2018
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Feb 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Feb 2018