THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:57:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Edinburgh, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3-11400 Tecumseh Rd E
McLean Medical
Windsor ON N8N 1L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2268260810
Fax: 5192510974
Address: 3000 Banwell Rd
Windsor ON N8N 0B3
Phone: 5197353204
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Mar 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 05 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael McLean Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jan 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. McLean (CPSO#: 114468 )
Business Address: 11400 Tecumseh Rd E
Windsor ON N8N 1L7
(226)826-0810

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Edinburgh, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3-11400 Tecumseh Rd E
McLean Medical
Windsor ON N8N 1L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2268260810
Fax: 5192510974
Address: 3000 Banwell Rd
Windsor ON N8N 0B3
Phone: 5197353204
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Mar 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 05 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael McLean Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jan 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. McLean (CPSO#: 114468 )
Business Address: 11400 Tecumseh Rd E
Windsor ON N8N 1L7
(226)826-0810

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL WILLIAM MCLEAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCLEAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL WILLIAM MCLEAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCLEAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Edinburgh, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Apr 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2018
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Apr 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Apr 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Feb 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 08 Feb 2018