THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:35:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: George Washington University, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: F33-4300 Steeles Ave E
Markham ON L3R 0Y5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056047889
Fax: 9056047890

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. SHU-CHIEH YU MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Yu (CPSO#: 114493 )
Business Address: F33-4300 Steeles Ave E
Markham ON L3R 0Y5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: George Washington University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: F33-4300 Steeles Ave E
Markham ON L3R 0Y5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056047889
Fax: 9056047890

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. SHU-CHIEH YU MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Yu (CPSO#: 114493 )
Business Address: F33-4300 Steeles Ave E
Markham ON L3R 0Y5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHU-CHIEH YU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHU-CHIEH YU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: George Washington University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 03 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 May 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 03 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 May 2018