THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:40:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Southampton, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 151 Bloor St W
Suite 890
Toronto ON M5S 1S4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 420-5033
Fax: (647) 480-5033

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Feb 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 15 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
Sinai Health System Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vibhuti Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Gupta (CPSO#: 114496 )
Business Address: 151 Bloor St W
Suite 890
Toronto ON M5S 1S4
(647) 420-5033

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Southampton, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 151 Bloor St W
Suite 890
Toronto ON M5S 1S4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 420-5033
Fax: (647) 480-5033

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Feb 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 15 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
Sinai Health System Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vibhuti Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Gupta (CPSO#: 114496 )
Business Address: 151 Bloor St W
Suite 890
Toronto ON M5S 1S4
(647) 420-5033

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VIBHUTI GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VIBHUTI GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Southampton, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Feb 2018
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Feb 2018