THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:14:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 407-1366 Yonge St
Toronto ON M4T 3A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 925-3843
Fax: (416) 968-7952

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Warren Albert Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Dec 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Albert (CPSO#: 114580 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 407-1366 Yonge St
Toronto ON M4T 3A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 925-3843
Fax: (416) 968-7952

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Warren Albert Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Dec 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Albert (CPSO#: 114580 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WARREN NATHANIEL ALBERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALBERT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WARREN NATHANIEL ALBERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALBERT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 2018
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Mar 2018