THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 02:52:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Nevis), 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SINHALA, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2-1801 Harwood Ave N
Ajax ON L1T 0K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-428-6131
Fax: 905-428-6280

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Aug 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 10 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York
USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Nagaratnam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Apr 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Nagaratnam (CPSO#: 114582 )
Business Address: 2-1801 Harwood Ave N
Ajax ON L1T 0K8
905-428-6131

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SINHALA, TAMIL
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Nevis), 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2-1801 Harwood Ave N
Ajax ON L1T 0K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-428-6131
Fax: 905-428-6280

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Aug 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 10 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York
USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Nagaratnam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Apr 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Nagaratnam (CPSO#: 114582 )
Business Address: 2-1801 Harwood Ave N
Ajax ON L1T 0K8
905-428-6131

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SIVAKARAN NAGARATNAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAGARATNAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SIVAKARAN NAGARATNAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAGARATNAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Nevis), 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Feb 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 24 Aug 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 2018
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Feb 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Feb 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Mar 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 16 Mar 2018