THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:18:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 365 West Street
Simcoe Ontario N3Y1T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 426-0130
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 28 Oct 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 28 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Buller Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jun 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Buller (CPSO#: 114600 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 365 West Street
Simcoe Ontario N3Y1T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 426-0130
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 28 Oct 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 28 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Buller Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jun 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Buller (CPSO#: 114600 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAILEY ALEXANDRA ANNE BULLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BULLER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAILEY ALEXANDRA ANNE BULLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BULLER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Mar 2018
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Mar 2018