THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:11:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1100 Sheppard Ave E
Suite 403
North York ON M2K 2W1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-222-0660
Fax: 416-222-9238
Address: 21 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 1B6
Phone: 647-372-0365
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 520 Ellesmere Rd
Suite 501
Scarborough ON M1R 0B1
Phone: 416-291-7719
Fax: 416-287-3775

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Effective: 13 Oct 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology and Allergy
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 13 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Y. Sun Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 May 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Sun (CPSO#: 114626 )
Business Address: 520 Ellesmere Rd
Suite 501
Scarborough ON M1R 0B1
416-291-7719
Business Address: 21 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B6
(908) 897-0788
Business Address: Prohealth Medical Clinic
403 - 1100 Sheppard Avenue East
North York Ontario M2K 2W1
(416) 222-0660

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1100 Sheppard Ave E
Suite 403
North York ON M2K 2W1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-222-0660
Fax: 416-222-9238
Address: 21 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 1B6
Phone: 647-372-0365
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 520 Ellesmere Rd
Suite 501
Scarborough ON M1R 0B1
Phone: 416-291-7719
Fax: 416-287-3775

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Effective: 13 Oct 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology and Allergy
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 13 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Y. Sun Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 May 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Sun (CPSO#: 114626 )
Business Address: 520 Ellesmere Rd
Suite 501
Scarborough ON M1R 0B1
416-291-7719
Business Address: 21 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B6
(908) 897-0788
Business Address: Prohealth Medical Clinic
403 - 1100 Sheppard Avenue East
North York Ontario M2K 2W1
(416) 222-0660

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YUANHANG SUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YUANHANG SUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Apr 2018
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Apr 2018