THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:10:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 32B Centennial Dr
PO Box 460
Huron Community Family Health Team
Seaforth Ontario N0K 1W0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-600-2273
Fax: 519-600-2500
Address: 70 Spine Rd
Elliot Lake ON P5A 1X2
Phone: (705) 848-7181
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St Marys Memorial Hospital
267 Queen St W
St. Marys Ontario N4X 1C4
Phone: (519) 284-8320
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Stratford General Hospital
46 General Hospital Dr
Stratford Ontario N5A 2Y6
Phone: 519-272-8210
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 02 Mar 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 02 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North of Superior Healthcare Group Marathon
Sante Manitouwadge Health Manitouwadge
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
St Joseph's General Hospital Elliot Lake Elliot Lake
Seaforth Community Hospital Seaforth
HOSPITAL: North of Superior Healthcare Group
LOCATION: Marathon

HOSPITAL: Sante Manitouwadge Health
LOCATION: Manitouwadge

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: Clinton Public Hospital
LOCATION: Clinton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's General Hospital Elliot Lake
LOCATION: Elliot Lake

HOSPITAL: Seaforth Community Hospital
LOCATION: Seaforth

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daniel Dalcin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Dalcin (CPSO#: 114666 )
Business Address: 24 Centennial Dr
Seaforth ON n0k1w0

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 32B Centennial Dr
PO Box 460
Huron Community Family Health Team
Seaforth Ontario N0K 1W0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-600-2273
Fax: 519-600-2500
Address: 70 Spine Rd
Elliot Lake ON P5A 1X2
Phone: (705) 848-7181
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St Marys Memorial Hospital
267 Queen St W
St. Marys Ontario N4X 1C4
Phone: (519) 284-8320
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Stratford General Hospital
46 General Hospital Dr
Stratford Ontario N5A 2Y6
Phone: 519-272-8210
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 02 Mar 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 02 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North of Superior Healthcare Group Marathon
Sante Manitouwadge Health Manitouwadge
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
St Joseph's General Hospital Elliot Lake Elliot Lake
Seaforth Community Hospital Seaforth
HOSPITAL: North of Superior Healthcare Group
LOCATION: Marathon

HOSPITAL: Sante Manitouwadge Health
LOCATION: Manitouwadge

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: Clinton Public Hospital
LOCATION: Clinton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's General Hospital Elliot Lake
LOCATION: Elliot Lake

HOSPITAL: Seaforth Community Hospital
LOCATION: Seaforth

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daniel Dalcin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Dalcin (CPSO#: 114666 )
Business Address: 24 Centennial Dr
Seaforth ON n0k1w0

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIEL STEPHEN DALCIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DALCIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIEL STEPHEN DALCIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DALCIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 18 Nov 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 04 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 May 2018
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Mar 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Feb 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 18 Nov 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 04 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 May 2018