THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:58:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Cape Town Faculty of Health Sciences, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 150 King St W
Suite 230
Toronto ON M5H 1J9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 833 236 1781
Fax: 833 523 2424

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 18 May 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 18 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
South Africa

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brigitte Van Heerden Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jan 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. B. van Heerden (CPSO#: 114670 )
Business Address: 32 Park Road
Toronto Ontario M4W 2N4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Cape Town Faculty of Health Sciences, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 150 King St W
Suite 230
Toronto ON M5H 1J9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 833 236 1781
Fax: 833 523 2424

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 18 May 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 18 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
South Africa

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brigitte Van Heerden Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jan 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. B. van Heerden (CPSO#: 114670 )
Business Address: 32 Park Road
Toronto Ontario M4W 2N4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRIGITTE LAUREN VAN HEERDEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN HEERDEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRIGITTE LAUREN VAN HEERDEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN HEERDEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Cape Town Faculty of Health Sciences, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Aug 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Aug 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 13 Aug 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Apr 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 13 Apr 2018