THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 04:11:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Main Floor
490 Bramalea Rd
Brampton Ontario L6T 2H2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 792-6500
Fax: (905) 792-6853
Address: 8405 Financial Dr
Brampton ON L6Y 1M1
Phone: (905) 846-2299
Fax: (289) 720-2074

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 14 May 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 14 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. KOMAL SIDHU MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jul 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Sidhu (CPSO#: 114680 )
Business Address: Main Floor
490 Bramalea Road
Brampton Ontario L6T 0G1
(905) 792-6500
Business Address: 7-8405 Financial Dr
Brampton ON L6Y 1M1
905-846-2299

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Main Floor
490 Bramalea Rd
Brampton Ontario L6T 2H2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 792-6500
Fax: (905) 792-6853
Address: 8405 Financial Dr
Brampton ON L6Y 1M1
Phone: (905) 846-2299
Fax: (289) 720-2074

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 14 May 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 14 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. KOMAL SIDHU MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jul 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Sidhu (CPSO#: 114680 )
Business Address: Main Floor
490 Bramalea Road
Brampton Ontario L6T 0G1
(905) 792-6500
Business Address: 7-8405 Financial Dr
Brampton ON L6Y 1M1
905-846-2299

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
09 Aug 2022
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 09 2022
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Komal Preet Sidhu may practise medicine independently in paediatrics.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Komal Preet Sidhu may practise medicine independently in paediatrics.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 09 Aug 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 23 Aug 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 14 May 2018
DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 23 Aug 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 May 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 May 2018