THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:08:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Shanghai Second Medical College, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2-9255 Woodbine Ave
Cachet Medical Centre
Markham ON L6C 1Y9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-887-2222
Fax: 905-887-3655
Address: 5-3477 Kennedy Rd
Scarborough ON M1V 3Z7
Phone: (647) 508-2999
Fax: (833) 666-0597

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Beili Shi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Shi (CPSO#: 114707 )
Business Address: 2-9255 Woodbine Avenue
Cachet Medical Centre
Markham Ontario L6C 1Y9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN
Medical School: Shanghai Second Medical College, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2-9255 Woodbine Ave
Cachet Medical Centre
Markham ON L6C 1Y9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-887-2222
Fax: 905-887-3655
Address: 5-3477 Kennedy Rd
Scarborough ON M1V 3Z7
Phone: (647) 508-2999
Fax: (833) 666-0597

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Beili Shi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Shi (CPSO#: 114707 )
Business Address: 2-9255 Woodbine Avenue
Cachet Medical Centre
Markham Ontario L6C 1Y9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BEILI SHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BEILI SHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Shanghai Second Medical College, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018