THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 04:43:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Ave, Suite 602
Toronto Ontario M5G 1V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 20 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amanda Formosa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Dec 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Formosa (CPSO#: 114710 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Ave, Suite 602
Toronto Ontario M5G 1V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 20 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amanda Formosa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Dec 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Formosa (CPSO#: 114710 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMANDA FORMOSA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORMOSA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMANDA FORMOSA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORMOSA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 25 Nov 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 May 2018
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Apr 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 25 Nov 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Nov 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Nov 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 May 2018