THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:08:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: A5-9135 Keele St
Concord ON L4K 0J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-663-3937
Fax: 416-663-3731
Address: 3-130 Mulock Dr
Newmarket ON L3Y 7C5
Phone: 416-663-3937
Fax: 416-663-3731
Address: 408-2855 Markham Rd
Scarborough ON M1X 0C3
Phone: 416-663-3937
Fax: 416-663-3731
Address: 60 Murray Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 3L9
Phone: (416) 586-4800
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
Oak Valley Health - Uxbridge Hospital Uxbridge
Oak Valley Health Markham
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health - Uxbridge Hospital
LOCATION: Uxbridge

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: YOGESH PATODIA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Aug 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Patodia (CPSO#: 114720 )
Business Address: 4812-488 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 0C1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: A5-9135 Keele St
Concord ON L4K 0J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-663-3937
Fax: 416-663-3731
Address: 3-130 Mulock Dr
Newmarket ON L3Y 7C5
Phone: 416-663-3937
Fax: 416-663-3731
Address: 408-2855 Markham Rd
Scarborough ON M1X 0C3
Phone: 416-663-3937
Fax: 416-663-3731
Address: 60 Murray Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 3L9
Phone: (416) 586-4800
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
Oak Valley Health - Uxbridge Hospital Uxbridge
Oak Valley Health Markham
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health - Uxbridge Hospital
LOCATION: Uxbridge

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: YOGESH PATODIA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Aug 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Patodia (CPSO#: 114720 )
Business Address: 4812-488 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 0C1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YOGESH PATODIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATODIA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YOGESH PATODIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATODIA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018